WEST NORFOLK MUSIC CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music teaching on most instruments for all ages (4 to 104!) and abilities, mostly individually but also in small groups. We also run bands, an orchestra, smaller instrumental groups, choirs and workshops for young children which are free to all members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 06 March 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ana Teresa Joyette | Chair | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEREK EDWARD STRINGER | Trustee | 31 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith Lesley Head | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew McKay-Ferguson | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Veronica Anne Wilson | Trustee | 23 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Sanderson | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Conrad Philip Meehan | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Beatrice Jane Bray | Trustee | 29 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Jane Dix | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROF. PAUL FREDERICK DENNIS | Trustee | 29 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PATRICK TOBY WINTERINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £419.11k | £70.88k | £28.31k | £50.47k | £96.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.98k | £36.64k | £24.25k | £50.49k | £63.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 July 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 September 2020 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 September 2020 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 26TH JANUARY 1985 AND 4TH OCTOBER 1988 as amended on 10 Jun 1997 as amended on 17 Jun 2019 as amended on 31 Jul 2019 as amended on 25 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
For the public benefit to advance the education of people of all ages, in West Norfolk and surrounding areas, in the art and science of music in such ways as the trustees think fit, including: a. Providing musical tuition and education on an individual or group basis b. Promoting the presentation of concerts c. Providing opportunities for individuals and groups to participate in musical activities
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
STATION HOUSE
STATION ROAD
LITTLE DUNHAM
KING'S LYNN
PE32 2DJ
- Phone:
- 01760725092
- Email:
- westnorfolkmc@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window