DOBERMANN RESCUE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity give shelter to sick or unwanted Dobermann with the view to re-homing the dogs. The ones that aren't rehomeable stay with the charity under lifetime sponsorship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 February 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN GIBBINS | Chair | 08 November 1992 |
|
|
||||
Susan Glennon | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzan Dolman | Trustee | 07 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Brown | Trustee | 16 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
IAN TREGANNA | Trustee | 28 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE ANNE INGRAM | Trustee | 06 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
ALLISON BRADLEY | Trustee | 25 November 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.57k | £418.40k | £21.55k | £64.00k | £248.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.90k | £45.15k | £76.84k | £94.50k | £70.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16TH MARCH 1984
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF DOGS OF THE DOBERMANN BREED IN PARTICULAR AND OTHER DOGS IN GENERAL IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Bretts Field
PEACEHAVEN
East Sussex
BN10 7UJ
- Phone:
- 01273649084
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window