6TH FALMOUTH (SEA) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
6TH FALMOUTH SEA SCOUTS ARE A ROYAL NAVY AFFILIATED SCOUT GROUP FOCUSING ON SEAMANSHIP AND SAILING THROUGHOUT THE SUMMER MONTHS AND LAND BASED SCOUTING IN THE WINTER. COMPRISING BEAVERS, CUBS, SCOUTS AND EXPLORERS ALL OF WHOM DEVELOP PERSONAL SKILLS THROUGH TEAM WORK AND EXPERIENCE THROUGH THE CHALLENGES DEVELOPED BY WATER AND LAND BASED ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 20 February 1985: Standard registration
- 6TH FALMOUTH SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Rowe | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Brookes | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Jane Lowe | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Stott | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
LANCE DAVID BROOKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.52k | £1.46k | £7.01k | £9.25k | £13.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.94k | £6.41k | £8.17k | £12.91k | £10.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTIONS OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Trescobeas Road
FALMOUTH
TR11 2JF
- Phone:
- 07905 515294
- Email:
- 6thfalmouthscouts@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window