Governing document LONDON ELECTRONIC ARTS LIMITED
Charity number: 291120
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH MARCH 1985 AS AMENDED 13TH JUNE 1988, 30TH SEPTEMBER 1988, 11TH DECEMBER 1990 BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AND 28TH JULY 1994
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL VIDEO AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT LIMITED THE FOREGOING THE ART OF VIDEO MAKING.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.