4th Sway

Charity number: 291145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SCOUT TROOP, CUB PACK

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £11,661
Total expenditure: £16,510

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SWAY SCOUTS (Working name)
  • 4TH NEW FOREST SOUTH (SWAY) SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Richard Bullen Chair 06 October 2015
None on record
ROBIN JAMES ABBOTT Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
DANIEL MARK DRAPER Trustee 18 September 2024
None on record
DOMINIC MARNELL Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.50k £26.61k £13.00k £3.82k £11.66k
Total expenditure £14.98k £2.32k £4.00k £7.96k £16.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.67k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 February 2024 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Quarr Lodge
Manchester Road
Sway
LYMINGTON
SO41 6AS
Phone:
01590681659
Website:

no.website