PORTSMOUTH FESTIVAL CHOIR

Charity Number: 291161
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rehearsal and performance of choral music.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022

Total income: £7,758
Total expenditure: £9,930

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Portsmouth City
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1985: Standard registration
  • 13 October 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 13 October 2023: Funds transferred to 279358 PORTSMOUTH BAROQUE CHOIR
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £17.96k £14.01k £10.39k £128 £7.76k
Total expenditure £19.38k £13.50k £9.81k £978 £9.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2022 05 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 31 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required