Financial history INDIA DEVELOPMENT GROUP (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 291167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £30.42k £31.48k £63.83k £22.76k £32.83k
Total expenditure £25.39k £20.91k £49.96k £32.17k £25.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A