INDIA DEVELOPMENT GROUP (UK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with people on the margins of rural society in India- low caste and tribal people, especially disadvantaged women- to help them build and sustain their individual, family and community livelihoods.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 21 February 1985: Standard registration
- IDG (Working name)
- JEEVIKA TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD GUPWELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Vipan Bij | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gourang Agrawal | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Mary Gower | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Eric Bottomley MA | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Thomas Lindsey | Trustee | 06 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Libby Cooper | Trustee | 24 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES REDPATH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAJ KUMAR SITLANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.42k | £31.48k | £63.83k | £22.76k | £32.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.39k | £20.91k | £49.96k | £32.17k | £25.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 22ND NOVEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS IN INDIA. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE PROBLEM OF POVERTY IN INDIA AND PARTICULARLY RURAL POVERTY BY CONCERTING THE SKILLS OF ENGINEERS, TECHNICIANS, SOCIAL AND NATURAL SCIENTISTS, ECONOMISTS, AGRONOMISTS, ENVIRONMENTAL HEALTH AND OTHER SPECIALISTS AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 3. THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE SCIENCES AND TECHNOLOGIES APPROPRIATE FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF POOR RURAL COMMUNITIES IN INDIA, PARTICULARLY SMALL-SCALE PROJECTS, PROGRAMMES AND SCHEMES, TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AND TO APPLY THE SAME FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hamilton Eddy & Co
39 Tamworth Road
CROYDON
CR0 1XU
- Phone:
- 07810340211
- Email:
- mark@jeevika.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window