THE REDCOATS SOCIETY, THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF THE RIFLES (BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE) MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support The Rifles (Berkshire & Wiltshire) Museum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 07 March 1985: Standard registration
- THE REDCOATS SOCIETY, THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF THE RIFLES (BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE) MUSEUM (Working name)
- THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF THE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM THE DUKE OF EDINBURGH'S ROYAL REGIMENT (BERKSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE) (Previous name)
- THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL GLOUCESTERSHIRE BERKSHIRE & WILTSHIRE REGIMENT(SALISBURY) MUSEUM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Cook | Chair | 24 July 2024 |
|
|||||
William Horace Sherman | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Marsh | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN MCINTYRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR CHRIS BACON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LT COL RETD JOHN VENUS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LT COL RETD NORMAN WILLIAM MINTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.48k | £1.86k | £1.46k | £2.70k | £2.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.70k | £4.27k | £0 | £10 | £1.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11TH APRIL 1997 AND AMENDED BY RESOLUTION ON 18 JUNE 2008.
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE REGIMENTAL MUSEUM THROUGH THE ACTIVITY OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WARDROBE
58 THE CLOSE
SALISBURY
WILTSHIRE
SP1 2EX
- Phone:
- 01980 731070
- Email:
- sjrvenus@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window