Accounts and annual returns BUCKLAND DINHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 291193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 June 2022 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required