Financial history BUCKLAND DINHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 291193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.04k £15.18k £13.94k £5.57k £11.26k
Total expenditure £6.36k £4.13k £9.42k £6.10k £7.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.41k £8.42k N/A £400