Financial history HACKNEY CITY FARM LIMITED

Charity number: 291211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £434.36k £496.12k £496.90k £523.24k £459.63k
Total expenditure £479.67k £318.31k £433.34k £515.92k £465.18k
Income from government contracts £173.60k £47.13k £180.00k £60.00k N/A
Income from government grants £35.00k N/A £30.00k N/A £101.26k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £274.08k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £249.15k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £194.86k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £321.06k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A