Financial history CHESTNUT LANE AND ELANGENI SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 291212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £24.73k £7.29k £24.96k £25.76k £27.57k
Total expenditure £20.95k £1.01k £27.76k £70.93k £17.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A