MIRACLE CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of Christian and other charitable purposes and in, particular, to further education in the basic principles of Christian morality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Northamptonshire
- Barbados
- Ghana
- Jamaica
Governance
- 27 February 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev FRANCIS VAUGHAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joyce Ruth Haye | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abiola Agemoh-Davies | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Delroy Samuels | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sylvester Kavalo | Trustee | 12 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.41k | £219.18k | £249.04k | £249.07k | £279.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171.26k | £170.74k | £188.11k | £224.66k | £288.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £14.03k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 JANUARY 1985
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CCARRIED ON IN CONNECTION WITH THE MIRACLE CHURCH OF GOD IN CHRIST AND IN PARTICULAR TO FURTHER EDUCATION IN THE BASIC PRINCIPLES OF CHRISTIAN MORALITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36-38 Alexandra Road
Bedford
Bedfordshire
MK40 1JB
- Phone:
- 01234 215081
- Email:
- bedford@miraclecogic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window