SHALDON WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to promote for the benefit of the public the preservation and conservation of rare and endangered species together with plants and trees. The charity also aims to advance the education of the public about such endangered species and to conduct research throughout the world and publish reports and findings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 22 February 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Juliet Catherine Matthews | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr PENELOPE KIRSTEN HUNTLEY PULLEN | Trustee | 05 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Belinda Moore | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLARE VICTORIA WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH DAVID GERARD MICHAEL MCNULTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEWART WILLIAM MUIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.70k | £279.36k | £476.00k | £289.51k | £298.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £236.32k | £220.50k | £388.03k | £285.51k | £292.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.27k | £141.41k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH FEBRUARY 1985
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF RARE AND ENDANGERED SPECIES OF ANIMALS TOGETHER WITH PLANTS AND TREES. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY ABOUT WILDLIFE FLORA AND FAUNA AND TO CONDUCT RESEARCH AND ENQUIRY INTO THE SAME THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND TO PUBLISH RESULTS AND FINDINGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ness Drive
Shaldon
Devon
TQ14 0HP
- Phone:
- 01626872234
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window