Financial history SEAFORD MUSICAL THEATRE

Charity Number: 291270
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £40.90k £23.54k £24.40k £49.58k £36.82k
Total expenditure £44.23k £20.44k £32.22k £51.84k £31.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.57k £2.75k N/A N/A