Governing document SEAFORD MUSICAL THEATRE
Charity Number: 291270

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 03/01/1985 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2013 AS AMENDED ON 24 OCT 2016 as amended on 28 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL EXPERIENCES IN MUSICAL THEATRE AND STAGECRAFT. TO PROVIDE THEATRICAL EXPERIENCES WITHIN AND FOR THE COMMUNITY. TO PROVIDE A THEATRICAL VENUE WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SEAFORD AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.