Financial history THE MELROSE RESOURCES PLC CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 291281
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.75k
Total expenditure £200 £300 £0 £0 £11.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A