ST FRANCIS AND HURSTWOOD HOSPITALS MUSEUM TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public talks on local history. Caring for a collection of historic artefacts and records.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 20 May 1985: Standard registration
- 26 October 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ST FRANCIS & HURSTWOOD PARK HOSPITALS MUSEUM TRUST (Working name)
- ST FRANCIS HOSPITAL MUSEUM & SOCIAL HISTORY CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65 | £1.02k | £0 | £0 | £2.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £21 | £15 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 18 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 03 February 2010 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 14 August 2009 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 23 August 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
A. TO PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF THE MUSEUM COMPRISING THE EXISTING COLLECTION TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER EXHIBITS OR ITEMS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE COMPRISED IN THE TRUST FUND AND TO PRESERVE THE SAME AS A MUSEUM AND AS A COLLECTION ("THE COLLECTION"). B. TO PROMOTE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE AREA OF THE MID DOWNS HEALTH AUTHORITY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window