THE AUSTIN CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a small family charity, not donating more than ?500 a year to individual charities or persons involved in fund raising for a charity. We have set charities we donate to each year. Therefore, we do not donate to any charities that we have never had contact before, or are out of our area of concern.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 March 1985: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- RUTH V AUSTIN & CLARE S LUBIN (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2013 | 04/04/2014 | 04/04/2015 | 04/04/2016 | 04/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £300 | £300 | £300 | £375 | £300 | |
|
Total expenditure | £351 | £405 | £359 | £300 | £285 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2017 | 29 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2016 | 31 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27TH FEBRUARY 1985
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME AT THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window