SWINDON 10 TO 18 PROJECT (S.T.E.P.)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Therapeutic group work for young people who are experiencing difficulties in their lives. Activities include sports, games, art and drama with a specific theme behind them e.g. anger management.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Total income includes £116,872 from government contract(s) and £11,892 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Swindon
Governance
- 24 April 1985: Standard registration
- 26 January 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 26 January 2019: Funds transferred to 1176672 STEP (SWINDON)
- SWINDON TEN - EIGHTEEN PROJECTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.22k | £172.48k | £187.77k | £175.25k | £235.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.79k | £180.88k | £207.91k | £195.46k | £182.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £156.53k | £161.19k | £159.73k | £116.87k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £11.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 05 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 05 December 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 09 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 22 February 2018 | 22 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 15 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 15 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 27 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 27 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH JANUARY 1985 AS AMENDED APRIL 1998 AND 28 JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED 15 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 6 AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 10 AND 18 YEARS RESIDING IN BOROUGH OF SWINDON IN PARTICULAR WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY THE PROVISION OF A PROGRAMME OF EDUCATION FOR SUCH PERSONS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR TECHNICAL AND SOCIAL SKILLS AND TO PROVIDE INSTRUCTIONS IN GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF SWINDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window