FRIENDS OF COLUMBUS SCHOOL AND COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide funds and equipment for the school and children with disabilities who attend the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 21 March 1985: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF CNMSS (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF CHELMSFORD NEW MODEL SPECIAL SCHOOL (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF THE HAYWARD SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenni Samouilhan Chair | Chair | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tara Necker Treasurer | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Petty Vice Chair | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.06k | £8.41k | £15.15k | £16.17k | £18.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.40k | £20.16k | £8.89k | £18.93k | £6.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH NOVEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 27TH FEBRUARY 1985 AND 1ST MAY 2008 AS AMENDED 18 MAY 2009 as amended on 10 May 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOO BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Columbus School & College
School Campus
Oliver Way
CHELMSFORD
CM1 4ZB
- Phone:
- 01245 491492
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window