THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF MINIATURE PAINTERS SCULPTORS AND GRAVERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The RMS uphold & continue the tradition of miniature painting. It provides artists with opportunity to exhibit their work annually in a prestigious London gallery (entry open to all); during exhibition members demonstrate their unique techniques to the public who wish to learn how to paint miniatures. It nurtures new young talent. It offers advice & help to artists and clients throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 March 1985: Standard registration
- THE R M S (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Walbank | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ray Winder PRMS | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carole Flanders VPRMS | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Eaton VPRMS | Trustee | 30 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.09k | £16.32k | £31.98k | £15.86k | £29.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.09k | £6.71k | £38.99k | £16.98k | £46.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 28TH FEBRUARY 1985
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PRMOTING THE FINE ART OF MINIATURE PAINTING OR ANY ALLIED ART.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Broad Green
Cranfield
BEDFORD
MK43 0JJ
- Phone:
- 07484227643
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window