Accounts and annual returns THE CHILDREN'S THEATRE COMPANY OF LONDON

Charity number: 291395
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 13 March 2014 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 25 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required