LIVINGSTONE RARA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the charity consists of running one adult amateur football team, competing at the Veteran level. The team competes in various competitions both at a local and national level. Training facilities are available and can be used by current or former team members and non-team members from the local area. It is anticipated to set up a second Veteran's team once funds are available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Merton
- Surrey
Governance
- 01 November 1985: Standard registration
- 08 February 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LIVINGSTONE FC (Working name)
- LIVINGSTONE RARA F C (Working name)
- LIVINGSTONE RES RARA F C (Working name)
- LIVINGSTONE VETS RARA F C (Working name)
- MERTON RISLEY F C (Working name)
- RISLEY ATHLETIC RECREATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.10k | £12.06k | £12.19k | £11.46k | £9.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.52k | £14.45k | £13.03k | £11.28k | £9.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25TH JUNE 1985 AS AMENDED 11 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window