Accounts and annual returns PULFORD SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 291429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 26 September 2024 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 28 October 2023 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 October 2023 485 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 July 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required