THE STOCKWELL CENTRE (COLCHESTER) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Psychotherapy & Counselling
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 02 May 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JOANNA BISDEE | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BARTHOLOMEW | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr SEBASTIAN RANDALL | Trustee | 07 February 2011 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CORNES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.53k | £41.39k | £50.46k | £57.00k | £59.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.19k | £38.28k | £61.78k | £52.09k | £50.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION 19TH SEPTEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED ON 15TH MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM PSYCHOLOGICAL OR EMOTIONAL DISORDER BY THE USE OF PSYCHOTHERAPY, PSYCHODYNAMIC COUNSELLING AND OTHER SUITABLE TECHNIQUES AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT CHARITABLE WORK IN THE RELIEF OF SUCH PATIENTS AND TO PROVIDE THE AFORESAID TREATMENT TO IMPECUNIOUS PATIENTS EITHER AT REDUCED FEES OR FREE OF CHARGE. 2. TO PROVIDE TRAINING IN PSYCHOTHERAPEUTIC, PSYCHODYNAMIC COUNSELLING AND OTHER SIMILAR TECHNIQUES, SUCH TRAINING TO BE GIVEN TO PROFESSIONAL PERSONS ALREADY INVOLVED IN VOLUNTARY OR STATUTORY SCHEMES FOR THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM PSYCHOLOGICAL AND EMOTIONAL DISORDERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 EAST STOCKWELL STREET
COLCHESTER
CO1 1SR
- Phone:
- 01206768211
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window