MOUNT ZION 7TH DAY CHURCH OF GOD (UK INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH. PREACHING THE WORD OF GOD AND MAKING IT RELRVANTTO PEAPLES EVERYDAYEXPERIENCES. ENCOURAGING INDIVIDUALS HOW TO DEAL WITH RESPONSIBILITIES AND RELATIONSHIP IN THEIR COMMUNITY AND TO LIVE TOGETHER
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 1985: Standard registration
- MOUNT ZION 7TH DAY CHURCH OF GOD ENGLAND CONFERENCE (Previous name)
- MOUNT ZION SANCTUARY 7TH DAY CHURCH OF GOD ENGLAND CONFERENCE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ERIC SATFORD HENRY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
YVONNE IRONE DE CUNHA | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
GOLDIE ANN KARINA DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS V JOSEPH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.61k | £61.51k | £95.01k | £154.37k | £93.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.52k | £44.49k | £99.16k | £137.85k | £17.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 15TH MARCH 1985, AS AMENDED 12 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF: (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH AS SET OUT IN THE ACT OF CONSTITUTION AND DECLARATION. (B) ANY CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST FLOOR
14-16 POWIS STREET
WOOLWICH
LONDON
SE18 6LF
- Phone:
- 02088553793
- Email:
- mountzion@btopenworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window