GATHERING VOICES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and learning amongst the public generally and more particularly amongst those engaged in the fields of training and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 1985: Standard registration
- GATHERING VOICES (Working name)
- VIEW TO LEARNING LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HANNAH KLEWIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Pearce | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Kirby | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Eastwood | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Townend | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE HARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICHOLAS SPOLLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.05k | £72.96k | £68.13k | £123.05k | £108.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.07k | £33.38k | £71.22k | £116.95k | £104.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £14.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH MARCH 1985, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 6 APRIL 2009.
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND LEARNING AMONGST THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND MORE PARTICULARLY AMONGST THOSE ENGAGED IN THE FIELDS OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 Quantock Road
BRISTOL
BS3 4PQ
- Phone:
- 07980765947
- Email:
- info@gatheringvoices.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window