Governing document INSTITUTE FOR THE MANAGEMENT OF INFORMATION SYSTEMS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/02/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/07/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/05/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/05/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/09/1985 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/1993 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05/07/2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE AFFILIATED MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTE IN THE UNDERSTANDING OF DATA RECORDING AND PROCESSING EITHER BY HAND OR ELECTRICAL OR ELECTRONIC OR MECHANICAL OR OTHER MEANS, IN SCHOOLS COLLEGES AND ALL OTHER LEVELS OF THE EDUCATION SYSTEM AND IN CONFERENCES AND DEBATES OPEN TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.