THE OXFORD CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission: To witness God's love to the Chinese people in the Oxford area and nurture believers to become faithful disciples of Jesus Christ our Lord. We have Sunday services with Sunday school for youth and children, Bible study groups in different locations in Oxfordshire, Language Fellowship cell groups (in Mandarin, Cantonese & English), Sisterhood Fellowship and X-Life Student Fellowship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 02 April 1985: Standard registration
- O C C C (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sunny Yat Hang Ma | Chair | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Tat Shing Benny Ngo | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ling Fung David Wong | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yiu Cheong Wu | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hong Zhou | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr TZE TO TOBY LO | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Henry KOON HUNG MO | Trustee | 17 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
RUTH LOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHUN EI HO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.93k | £61.97k | £73.71k | £119.29k | £166.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.26k | £56.83k | £80.10k | £117.27k | £122.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 20 MAY 1984, 3 MARCH 1985, 24 MAY 1987, 13 MARCH 1988, 2 DECEMBER 1990, 6 FEBRUARY 1994, 28 FEBRUARY 1999, 15 DECEMBER 2002 AND 28 MARCH 2010.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE CHINESE LANGUAGE AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE OXFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 Lime Walk
Headington
Oxford
OX3 7AD
- Phone:
- 01865841723
- Email:
- oxfordccc@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window