Governing document THE OXFORD CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH
Charity number: 291514

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 20 MAY 1984, 3 MARCH 1985, 24 MAY 1987, 13 MARCH 1988, 2 DECEMBER 1990, 6 FEBRUARY 1994, 28 FEBRUARY 1999, 15 DECEMBER 2002 AND 28 MARCH 2010.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE CHINESE LANGUAGE AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE OXFORD AND ITS ENVIRONS
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.