Trustees THE OXFORD CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH
Charity number: 291514

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sunny Yat Hang Ma | Chair | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Tat Shing Benny Ngo | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ling Fung David Wong | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yiu Cheong Wu | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hong Zhou | Trustee | 29 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr TZE TO TOBY LO | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Henry KOON HUNG MO | Trustee | 17 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
RUTH LOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHUN EI HO | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.