Governing document BEDFORD CHORAL SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/09/1974 AS AMENDED ON 18/03/1985 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/1988 AS AMENDED ON 17/06/1995 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/1995 AS AMENDED ON 30/10/2000 AS AMENDED ON 28/09/2015 as amended on 21 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
(1) THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ORDER TO FOSTER THE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE. (2) TO PROVIDE A REGULAR SERIES OF FIRST CLASS CHORAL CONCERTS BY MAINTAINING A CHORUS, AND BY ENGAGING ORCHESTRAS AND ARTISTS OF HIGH REPUTE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.