SOMERSET CRICKET MUSEUM LIMITED

Charity Number: 291525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public in the history and development of cricket by establishing and operating a museum for the permanent exhibition and presentation of education and/or historic value and particularly in regard to the Somerset County Cricket Club.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £11,445
Total expenditure: £13,978

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 April 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Charles Hildreth Trustee 31 March 2023
None on record
Michael John Unwin Trustee 31 March 2023
None on record
Dr Peter January Trustee 31 March 2022
None on record
Nigel David Power Trustee 31 March 2021
None on record
Alain David John Lockyer Trustee 28 March 2019
None on record
Anthony Alan Gibson Trustee 28 March 2019
THE ROYAL BATH AND WEST OF ENGLAND SOCIETY
Received: On time
Michael John Tarr Trustee 28 March 2019
None on record
RICHARD JOHN WALSH Trustee
None on record
DAVID JOSEPH WOOD Trustee
RICHARD HUISH COLLEGE FOUNDATION
Received: 14 days late
SIR PETER GORON WALLIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.36k £4.56k £4.48k £10.13k £11.45k
Total expenditure £14.16k £10.77k £11.57k £9.32k £13.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 January 2022 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 PRIORY AVENUE
TAUNTON
SOMERSET
TA1 1XX
Phone:
01823275893