Trustees COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR REFUGEES FROM VIETNAM LAOS AND CAMBODIA
Charity number: 291530

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THINH VAN LAI | Chair | 06 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Savannah Pham | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thuy Chan Nong | Trustee | 14 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAM VAN HUYNH | Trustee | 13 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
LOAN ANH NGUYEN | Trustee | 13 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAN KIEN TRAN | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|||||
KHAMSAY PHOMMAVONGSA | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANNA THAO LAI | Trustee | 06 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
TAI PHAT TU | Trustee | 30 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
SOBOPHA OWEN | Trustee | 07 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
DINH PHAM | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.