18TH BROMLEY (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 291546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Young Person activities - Beaver, Cub & Scout Troop

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £12,200
Total expenditure: £9,890

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 May 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
TRACEY LEON-CUTLER Chair
None on record
Edward Andrew Richard Mozley Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Ema Locker Trustee 21 February 2025
25TH BROMLEY (ST ANDREW'S) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Richard Graham Paget Davis Trustee 24 January 2025
None on record
Rachel Victoria Hodges Trustee 14 June 2024
None on record
Edwina Sarah Davis Trustee 24 January 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £17.09k £4.36k £8.04k £11.12k £12.20k
Total expenditure £15.17k £4.23k £5.72k £12.20k £9.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 09 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. MARYS CHURCH
61 COLLEGE ROAD
BROMLEY
BR1 3QG
Phone:
020 8466 6969
Website:

No information available