Accounts and annual returns ST THOMAS MORE SCHOOL LETCHWORTH PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 291593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 10 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 10 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required