Financial history ST THOMAS MORE SCHOOL LETCHWORTH PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 291593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.78k £3.90k £7.89k £11.44k £9.12k
Total expenditure £7.01k £5.48k £3.84k £11.10k £4.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A