CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION FOR RACIAL JUSTICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO WORK WITHIN THE CATHOLIC CHURCH AND THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION AND THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE AND CONSONANT WITH THE CATHOLIC FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 May 1985: Standard registration
- 10 November 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 November 2014: Funds transferred to 1158338 CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION FOR RACIAL JUSTICE
- CARJ (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.87k | £142.95k | £133.93k | £176.14k | £252.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.79k | £143.46k | £103.98k | £88.04k | £138.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 20 June 2014 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 20 June 2014 | 140 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 23 December 2013 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 23 December 2013 | 326 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2013 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 31 January 2013 | 366 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
TO WORK WITHIN THE CATHOLIC CHURCH AND THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION AND THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE AND CONSONANT WITH THE CATHOLIC FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window