ST IVES CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mixed choir of around 80 voices. Normally three or four concerts each year in St Ives including a family Christmas concert. Works from the classical choral repertoire are performed with orchestra and professional soloists. Rehearsals Tuesday evenings. A new work by Tom Randle based on the life of Cromwell was commissioned and performed with students of St Ivo School in March 2023.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 11 June 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATRINA MILLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen York | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Godfrey | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.67k | £5.82k | £11.06k | £13.88k | £19.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.62k | £9.86k | £13.35k | £19.00k | £18.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH OCTOBER 1984 AS AMENDED 5TH MARCH 1985 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE THE PROMOTION, DEVELOPMENT AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hawthorn Cottage
Holywell
St Ives
Cambridgeshire
PE27 4TQ
- Phone:
- 07768924249
- Email:
- info@stives-choral.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window