THE BRITAIN-AUSTRALIA BICENTENNIAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To commemorate the Bicentenary of the European Settlement in Australia by engaging in and promoting either alone or with others any charitable purposes towards establishing and contributing to educational trusts in the United Kingdom for the benefit of Australians and to grant educational bursaries and scholarships for Australians coming to study in the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 May 1985: Standard registration
- 29 September 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 29 September 2014: Funds transferred to 221810 VISCOUNT WAKEFIELD'S PHILLIP MEMORIAL FUND
- B A B T (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.45k | £4.45k | £7.66k | £5.71k | £4.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.92k | £4.92k | £12.63k | £5.54k | £5.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 08 April 2014 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 27 June 2013 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 10 February 2012 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 27TH MARCH 1985
Charitable objects
WITH A VIEW TO COMMEMORATING THE BICENTENARY OF THE EUROPEAN SETTLEMENT OF AUSTRALIA, TO ENGAGE IN AND PROMOTE EITHER ALONE OR WITH OTHERS ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window