MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL SCHOOL GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes available funds to support small to medium-scale research activities to further the charity's aims of the advancement of medical education and research in the Medical School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 04 July 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Deborah Gill | Chair | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert Unwin | Trustee | 21 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PHILIP STANIER BSc PhD | Trustee | 10 November 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.80k | £32.72k | £38.01k | £42.29k | £37.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.47k | £52.27k | £52.48k | £53.06k | £54.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST APRIL 1985
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN THE MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL MEDICAL OR THE MIDDLESEX HOSPITAL.(II) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE SAID SCHOOL OR THE SAID HOSPITAL AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.(III) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR SUCH CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS (WHETHER OR NOT CONNECTED WITH THE SAID SCHOOL OR THE SAID HOSPITAL) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN LIKE MANNER DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST APRIL 1985
Contact information
- Address:
-
Financial Accounting
UCL Finance & Business Affairs
Gower Street
London
WC1E 6BT
- Phone:
- 02031087213
- Email:
- r.lane@ucl.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window