THE HERPES VIRUSES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Patient-run: website, booklets, a helpline run by trained volunteers who can answer medical questions and counsel people with any psychological worries. For subscribers: quarterly journals, leaflets on all aspects of the virus, meetings, seminars. Re shingles and neurogenic pain, we supply a 17-page information pack. This pain is especially severe in the elderly and is difficult to treat.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 April 1985: Standard registration
- H V A (Working name)
- SHINGLES SUPPORT SOCIETY (Working name)
- SPHERE (Working name)
- THE HERPES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £150.84k | £160.84k | £150.55k | £233.63k | £155.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.87k | £144.03k | £157.76k | £163.04k | £174.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 February 2024 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH APRIL 1985 AS AMENDED 3RD DECEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED 7TH JULY 2001 AS AMENDED 17 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH BY ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION ABOUT HERPES VIRUSES AND THE MEANS BY WHICH THESE CONDITIONS MAY BE MOST EFFECTIVELY PREVENTED AND TREATED. 2. TO PROMOTE, OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF HERPES SIMPLEX AND ITS EFFECTS ON THE PERSONS WHO CONTRACT IT, AND TO DISSMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 3. TO RELIEVE PERSONS WITH SYMPTOMS OF HERPES SIMPLEX.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HERPES VIRUSES ASSOCIATION
OMNIBUS BUSINESS CENTRE
Unit 110
39-41 NORTH ROAD
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02076079661
- Email:
- info@herpes.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window