BAMPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 291659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Hall is used for community led activities including sales, sports, Bridge Club, charity events, meetings including AGM's, cinema, theatrical and musical performances, and parties both adult & childrens.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £12,458
Total expenditure: £23,778

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 July 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY HALL Chair
None on record
Lauren Dore Trustee 23 October 2024
ONE WISH DOG FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Anna Leigh Smart Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Catherine Diane Coombes Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Andrew Drake Trustee 26 January 2018
None on record
Richard Smith Trustee 18 November 2016
None on record
Angela Irvin Trustee 18 April 2016
None on record
Angela Newland Trustee 27 March 2014
None on record
MARGARET WILLIAMS Trustee 01 January 2013
None on record
PATRICIA SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.02k £20.63k £23.23k £12.09k £12.46k
Total expenditure £15.06k £10.73k £7.92k £9.30k £23.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £17.91k £750 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 11 SEP 2001
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BAMPTON OXFORDSHIRE
Registration history
  • 26 July 2004 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Bampton VillageHall
Market Square
Bampton
OX18 2JH
Phone:
07887403401
Website:

No information available