GLOUCESTERSHIRE PROBATION OFFICERS' SAMARITAN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes payments of Grants to individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 07 May 1985: Standard registration
- 30 October 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 30 October 2015: Funds transferred to 1056672 THE NELSON TRUST
- THE PROBATION SAMARITAN FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £554 | £4.16k | £765 | £864 | £5.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.73k | £1.44k | £927 | £1.13k | £1.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 12 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 17 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 14 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
FOUNDATION DEED DATED 31ST OCTOBER 1979
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE TRUST AND SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 5 AND FIRST SCHEDULE OF DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window