1ST COPTHORNE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides the organisation and financial support to Scouters, in order that they may provide Scouting activities for the youth of Copthorne Village and surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- West Sussex
Governance
- 29 April 1985: Standard registration
- 08 July 2019: Funds received from 281554 REDEHALL PREPARATORY SCHOOL FOUNDATION LIMITED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HAMMOND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Miles Price | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hammond | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mario Paolino Monella | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Owen Cheesmur | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DAWSON | Trustee | 20 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
GWYN RONALD CHEESMUR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.44k | £33.98k | £62.10k | £68.51k | £60.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.62k | £16.97k | £45.20k | £75.74k | £52.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.67k | £13.33k | £10.79k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 20 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER - 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTIONS OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Erica Way
Copthorne
CRAWLEY
RH10 3XG
- Phone:
- 07740098844
- Email:
- john.dawson@egscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window