Governing document DEVELOPMENT EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 291696
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JULY 1983 AS AMENDED 8 JUNE 1993, 22 NOVEMBER 2007, 27 NOVEMBER 2008, 4 NOVEMBER 2009 AND 2 NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN A GLOBAL CONTEXT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.