Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE CLIFFORD COOK MEMORIAL PRIZE
Charity number: 526022-18
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30TH JANUARY 1917 AS VARIED BY DEEDS OF 15TH NOVEMBER 1920 AND 21ST FEBRUARY 1963.
Charitable objects
THE PURCHASE OF A PRIZE TO BE PRESENTED AT THE ANNUAL SPEECH DAY OF THE CALDAY GRANGE GRAMMAR SCHOOL TO THE BOY WHO OBTAINS THE GREATEST NUMBER OF VOTES FROM BOYS IN THE SCHOOL FOR HAVING GOOD CHARACTER AND INFLUENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 19 May 1965: Standard registration
- 13 June 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.