BRISTOL DRUGS PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 291714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of information, harm reduction and treatment services for problem drug and alcohol users to enable individuals to achieve independence from drugs and alcohol. Over 4,000 individual adults and young people benefit from the charity's activities in any year.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 May 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BDP (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Graeme Henderson Prof Trustee 15 January 2024
None on record
Dr Peter Godfrey Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
Terence Rice Trustee 09 November 2021
None on record
Moyna Jane Wilkinson Trustee 09 November 2021
None on record
David Bradnock Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Roderick Douglas Mayall Trustee 19 May 2020
None on record
Kerry Barker Trustee 19 May 2020
None on record
Rosalind Dorothea Paine Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record
Jennifer Alice Eiloart Risk Trustee 04 September 2018
None on record
Kathleen Forgan Curling Trustee 04 September 2018
AVON TENNIS
Received: On time
Dr Tom Smyth Trustee 17 September 2015
None on record
JOHN ROSS LONG Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL DAVID LEA Trustee
BRISTOL CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
MAKE Southwest
Received: On time
BRISTOL CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE WAFFLEMEISTER FOUNDATION
Recently registered
BRISTOL RUGBY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.75m £3.71m £3.82m £4.24m £4.64m
Total expenditure £3.66m £3.64m £3.73m £4.20m £4.57m
Income from government contracts £3.28m £3.46m £3.64m £3.81m £3.28m
Income from government grants £15.29k £2.55k £99.76k £138.10k £895.04k
Income - Donations and legacies £176.71k £115.24k £50.31k £22.58k £39.12k
Income - Other trading activities £6.84k £461 £1.68k £3.67k £14.10k
Income - Charitable activities £3.54m £3.57m £3.76m £4.17m £4.41m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.76k £15.87k £14.13k £41.58k £95.37k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £125.00k £35.00k £8.90k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.66m £3.57m £3.72m £4.19m £4.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £70.92k £17.73k £10.33k £11.78k
Expenditure - Governance £11.86k £10.54k £12.33k £11.42k £11.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £4.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £43.46k £27.10k £16.54k £66.37k £93.06k
Long-term investments £16.00k £0 £16.00k £1.60k £2.14m
Other assets £4.25m £4.32m £4.79m £5.02m £3.29m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £479.55k £445.23k £834.16k £1.06m £1.43m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 February 2024 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 February 2024 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BRISTOL DRUGS PROJECT
11 BRUNSWICK SQUARE
BRISTOL
BS2 8PE
Phone:
01179876000